OR SCR16 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring D.E. "Denny" Jones for his services to the Legislative Assembly and the State of Oregon.
Title
Honoring D.E. "Denny" Jones for his services to the Legislative Assembly and the State of Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-05-31 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-05-27 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-26 | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-05-26 | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. | |
2011-05-17 | Taken from 05-17 Calendar and placed on 05-26 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2011-05-16 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-05-12 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-15 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-13 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/scr1.dir/scr0016.intro.html |