OR SCR12 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memoriam: Tom Whelan, 1948-2012.
Title
In memoriam: Tom Whelan, 1948-2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2013-05-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-23 | House | Read. Carried by Jenson. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bailey. |
2013-05-13 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-05-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Rosenbaum,Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Shields, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |