OR SB990 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 30, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 30, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to redistricting; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to redistricting; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date, June 30, 2011. | |
2011-06-30 | Chapter 599, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-30 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lindsay,Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Wand, Weidner. | |
2011-06-30 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-30 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-30 | Referred to Special Joint Committee on Redistricting. | |
2011-06-30 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-30 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer, Telfer. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Atkinson, Boquist, George, Girod, Kruse, Starr. | |
2011-06-30 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-06-29 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-29 | Referred to Special Joint Committee on Redistricting. | |
2011-06-29 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Special Joint Committee on Redistricting by order of the President. | |
2011-06-07 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Redistricting. | |
2011-05-16 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |