OR SB97 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Residential Facilities Ombudsman, designee of ombudsman or staff of ombudsman from being compelled to testify or produce documents related to complaint in any judicial or administrative proceeding. Prohibits Residential Facilities Ombudsman, designee of ombudsman or staff of ombudsman from being compelled to testify or produce documents related to complaint in any judicial or administrative proceeding. Protects records from compelled disclosure by any legal means. Specifies exceptions.
Title
Relating to confidentiality of complaints to the office of the Long Term Care Ombudsman.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 319, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Leif. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |