OR SB97 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires reinstatement of home and community-based services for child of military service member upon child's return to state after temporary absence due to parent's military obligation.
Title
Relating to services provided to a military service member's child who has a disability.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB97 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB97/Introduced |