OR SB964 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to Oregon Medical Marijuana Act, including limiting amount of plants that may be grown at addresses where marijuana grow sites are located and requiring registration of marijuana processing sites. Becomes operative March 1, 2016. Provides for testing of all marijuana items in this state and requires laboratories that conduct testing to be licensed by Oregon Health Authority. Becomes operative March 1, 2016. Imposes requirements for labeling and packaging of all marijuana items in this state. Becomes operative March 1, 2016. Allows cities and counties to adopt ordinances prohibiting establishment of marijuana processing sites and medical marijuana dispensaries in jurisdiction of city or county. Provides initiative process by which people of city or county may vote on question of whether marijuana processing sites and medical marijuana dispensaries should be allowed in jurisdiction of city or county. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to marijuana; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-05-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick, Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Prozanski. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Implementing Measure 91. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |