OR SB95 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires owners and operators of bulk petroleum terminals to conduct and submit to Department of Environmental Quality seismic vulnerability assessments. Requires department to review and approve seismic vulnerability assessments. Requires owner or operator of existing bulk petroleum terminal to submit seismic vulnerability assessment no later than January 1, 2020. Prohibits person from operating bulk petroleum terminal without seismic risk mitigation plan that is properly implemented and approved by department. Directs Environmental Quality Commission to, by rule, adopt seismic risk mitigation program for bulk petroleum terminals. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Authorizes commission and department to take actions before operative date. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to earthquake preparedness; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB95 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB95/Introduced |