OR SB941 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date, May 11, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date, May 11, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires private person to complete transfer of firearm by appearing with transferee before gun dealer to request criminal background check or shipping or delivering firearm to gun dealer in certain circumstances. Requires private person to complete transfer of firearm by appearing with transferee before gun dealer to request criminal background check or shipping or delivering firearm to gun dealer in certain circumstances. Specifies exceptions for family members, law enforcement, inherited firearms and certain temporary transfers. Punishes violation by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both, or maximum of 10 years' imprisonment, $250,000 fine, or both, for second or subsequent offense. Requires] Authorizes Department of State Police to notify local] appropriate law enforcement agency when, during criminal background check performed prior to transfer of firearm, department determines that recipient is prohibited from possessing firearm. Authorizes court to prohibit person ordered to participate in assisted outpatient treatment from purchasing or possessing firearm during period of treatment if certain criteria are met. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to firearms; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Effective date, May 11, 2015. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 050, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-05-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 32; Nays, 28--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson, Witt. |
2015-05-04 | House | Motion to postpone indefinitely failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 35--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-04 | House | Motion to refer to Judiciary failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 35--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-04 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 35--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-05-04 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 35--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-04-30 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-29 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-04-29 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-04-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-04-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Vote explanations filed by Knopp, Prozanski. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee on Judiciary failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Made a special order of business.Ayes, 18; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |