OR SB894 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes continuing appropriation to Water Resources Department for purpose of issuing grants for capital costs related to construction of dam to supersede Big Creek Dam Number 1 and Big Creek Dam Number 2 near City of Newport.
Title
Relating to capital construction projects involving dams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and referral to Rules and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |