OR SB890 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 528, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 528, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "legally protected material" to mean information and records of city that are protected by attorney-client privilege held by city and attorney work product prepared in course of providing legal services to city. Provides that disclosure of legally protected material to elected city auditor does not waive privilege with respect to any other person, to extent legally protected material is disclosed for purpose of audit or investigation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to privileged city information disclosed to elected city auditor; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 528, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, June 29, 2017. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Hansell. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |