OR SB852 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that part-time faculty member at public institution of higher education who qualifies for health care benefits will pay 10 percent of insurance premiums for employee coverage and 50 percent of increase in premium cost for employee and dependent coverage. Provides that part-time faculty member at public institution of higher education who qualifies for health care benefits will pay 10 percent of insurance premiums , with remaining 90 percent paid by state] for employee coverage and 50 percent of increase in premium cost for employee and dependent coverage. Requires state to pay for remaining costs of insurance premiums out of moneys appropriated to Oregon Educators Benefit Board. Permits institution to agree through collective bargaining to pay portion of employee's premium share. Provides that employees who are eligible to receive health care benefits in manner specified may receive health care benefits from institution only in manner specified. Provides that any savings realized by institution are subject to collective bargaining. Directs board to determine prior to open enrollment period whether it has received sufficient funds to cover required premium payments. Provides that if board has not received sufficient funds, board may require employee share to increase and that institution is not responsible for paying insurance premiums. Requires legacy health benefit coverage to be maintained for part-time faculty at institutions who are not eligible for health care benefits under provisions. Establishes Part-Time Faculty Insurance Fund and continuously appropriates moneys in fund to board. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to employees at public institutions of higher education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Education and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Education and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Education by order of the President. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Workforce, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |