OR SB851 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires, for Oregon personal income tax purposes, taxpayers to add back amounts deducted as deemed repatriation under one-time transition tax. Requires Department of Revenue to waive penalty or interest due to underpayment or underreporting resulting from add-back requirement. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017. Requires, for Oregon corporate excise or income tax purposes, addition to federal taxable income of amounts deducted as global intangible low-tax income. Allows 80 percent dividends received deduction for global intangible low-tax income. Provides for treatment of global intangible low-tax income in same manner as dividend. Requires apportionment of dividend or global intangible low-taxed income according to taxpayer's applicable apportionment formula. Disallows deduction for foreign-source dividend income, and excludes foreign-source dividend income from apportionment calculation. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax treatment of foreign earnings; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, September 29, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 556, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, September 29, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 556, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 11--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Nearman, Noble, Post, Smith DB, Wallan, Wilson; Absent, 1--Leif; Excused, 1--Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |