OR SB846 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits use of physical restraints in juvenile court proceedings on youth, youth offender or young person with exceptions. Prohibits use of physical restraints in transportation of youth, youth offender, young person, ward or child by Department of Human Services, Oregon Health Authority or agent of department or authority with exceptions.
Title
Relating to restraint of youth in custodial circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 257, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Boone, Hernandez, McKeown, Smith G, Wilson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Hansell. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |