OR SB845 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes penalty to be imposed by Employment Department on large employers whose employees receive health care coverage through medical assistance program. Appropriates penalties collected by department to Oregon Health Authority for specified purposes. Establishes remedy for employee who is retaliated against by employer for applying for or receiving medical assistance or premium tax credits under Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care for low-income workers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |