OR SB840 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes new water use limitations on fixtures.
Title
Relating to plumbing fixtures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2013-04-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 9--Baertschiger, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Johnson, Kruse, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Boquist, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |