OR SB830 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes definition of foster parent who is "current caretaker.". Changes definition of foster parent who is "current caretaker."
Title
Relating to foster parents who are current caretakers.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 351, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Greenlick, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-03-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--DeBoer, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |