OR SB826 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to Salvage Chief (LSM380) Foundation for purpose of repairing and upgrading salvage vessel. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to Salvage Chief (LSM380) Foundation for purpose of repairing and upgrading salvage vessel. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB826 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB826/Introduced |