OR SB822 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs presiding judge of each judicial district to instruct grand jury to record proceedings except for deliberations and voting . Directs presiding judge of each judicial district to ensure all] instruct grand jury to record proceedings except for deliberations and voting are recorded verbatim]. Authorizes recording by certified shorthand reporter or suitable audio electronic recording device operated by designated grand juror] grand jury clerk. Directs court to provide and maintain recording devices for recording of grand jury proceedings. Creates procedures for, and specifies limitations on, obtaining recordings or transcripts of grand jury proceedings. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the verbatim recording of grand jury proceedings; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |