OR SB815 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires residential care facilities to provide written notice to applicants for admission and to current residents upon request regarding services, types and level of care, potential for resident to be required to leave facility if facility can no longer meet resident's needs for care and services, possibility of resident not being permitted to return to facility if resident leaves facility for acute care and resident's right to appeal facility's decision to remove resident or to not permit resident to return after receiving acute care. Establishes requirements for written notice. Extends, for one year, deadline for residential care facilities to report on quality metrics and for Department of Human Services to publish report on residential care facilities' quality metrics. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to information that must be provided by residential care facilities; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, September 29, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 554, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, September 29, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 554, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Findley, Hernandez, Marsh, Nathanson, Reschke, Smith G, Smith Warner. |
2019-06-17 | House | Carried over to June 18, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |