OR SB807 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to research, study and compare behavioral health treatments in other states and report findings and conclusions to interim judiciary committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 20, 2022. Requires Oregon Health Authority to research, study and compare behavioral health treatments in other states and report findings and conclusions to interim judiciary committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 20, 2022.
Title
Relating to behavioral health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB807 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB807/Introduced |