OR SB806 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Oregon Business Development Department for support of Reedsport Public Library. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Reedsport Public Library; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |