OR SB783 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirement to notify Attorney General of elder abuse proceeding, making failure to notify not jurisdictional defect. Conditions entry of judgment for plaintiff on proof of notice.
Title
Relating to elder abuse proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 345, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Olsen. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |