OR SB777 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Prison Education. Requires task force to report to committees of Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2020. Sunsets on December 31, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to prison education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Education and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Education and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Education by order of the President. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |