OR SB769 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person may not dispose of, or transfer to another person for disposal, material or media that display Social Security number unless person, before disposing of material or media, makes Social Security number unreadable or unrecoverable or ensures that person that ultimately disposes of media or material makes Social Security number unreadable or unrecoverable. Provides that person may not dispose of, or transfer to another person for disposal, material or media that display Social Security number unless person, before disposing of material or media, makes Social Security number unreadable or unrecoverable or ensures that person that ultimately disposes of media or material makes Social Security number unreadable or unrecoverable.
Title
Relating to disposing of material that displays Social Security numbers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 254, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 53; Absent, 1--Hernandez; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Barnhart, Nathanson, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |