OR SB755 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and provides for implementation of Ballot Measure 110 (2020). Modifies and provides for implementation of Ballot Measure 110 (2020). Renames "Addiction Recovery Center" as "Behavioral Health Resource Network" and modifies services that must be provided by networks. Renames "24/7" triage as "screening" and specifies requirements for screening. Requires Oversight and Accountability Council to provide grants and funding to agencies and organizations to establish Behavioral Health Resource Networks. Modifies requirements for receiving grants and funding. If money remains available after grants and funding are committed to Behavioral Health Resource Networks, requires counties to provide grants and funding to other agencies or organizations to provide specified services. Requires grants and funding to be disbursed to ensure at lease one Behavioral Health Network is established within each county by January 1, 2022. Modifies quorum requirement for council. Provides that members of council are subject to provisions of ORS chapter 244, including requirement to submit statements of economic interest to Oregon Government Ethics Commission. Requires Oregon Health Authority to post on website information about recipients of grants or funding. Removes sunset on Behavioral Health Resource Network statewide telephone hotline established by authority. Specifies requirements for hotline. Directs Division of Audits of office of Secretary of State to conduct performance audits and financial reviews, beginning with real-time audit no later than December 31, 2023. Specifies scope of audits and financial reviews. Requires authority to quarterly report to Legislative Assembly on expenditures from Drug Treatment and Recovery Services Fund. Requires authority to report to interim subcommittee of Joint Committee on Ways and Means related to human services specified information about grants and funding awarded. Provides that minimum fine for Class E violation is $45. Directs court to dismiss Class E violation citation upon receiving verification that person completed substance use disorder screening. Requires enforcement officer issuing Class E violation citation to provide person receiving citation with information concerning how person may obtain screening. Directs Legislative Assembly to allocate moneys deposited into Criminal Fine Account as payment of fines on Class E violations to Drug Treatment and Recovery Services Fund. Provides that person may not be charged with crime of failure to appear on Class E violation. Prohibits juvenile court from waiving Class E violation proceeding to municipal court. Authorizes youth to enter into formal accountability agreement on Class E violation. Provides that municipal and justice courts have no jurisdiction over Class E violations. Makes possession of substantial quantity of Schedule I controlled substance, including heroin, lysergic acid diethylamide, 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine, psilocybin or psilocin, Class B felony punishable by maximum of 10 years' imprisonment, $250,000 fine, or both. Provides that possession of substantial quantity of Schedule II controlled substance, including cocaine, methamphetamine and fentanyl, constitutes Class C felony punishable by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Reduces penalties for possession of less than 40 pills, tablets, capsules or user units of hydrocodone to Class E violation punishable by maximum of $100 fine. Establishes substantial quantities of fentanyl for purposes of unlawful delivery, manufacture and possession offenses and mandatory sentences. Authorizes use of presumptive test for controlled substances as prima facie evidence of identity of controlled substance in Class E violation proceeding. Authorizes district attorney to initiate Class E violation proceeding when person is charged with offense that would constitute Class E violation had offense been committed on or after February 1, 2021. Makes form and style changes to provisions in Ballot Measure 110 (202
Title
Relating to substance use; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 591, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 19; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Burdick; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 15--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G, Weber; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |