OR SB751 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies definition of "disclose" for purposes of discovery requirements in criminal cases. Requires party in criminal case to provide hard copy or electronic copy of discovery material to adverse party unless copy cannot reasonably be provided.] Requires district attorney to disclose prior conviction record of all persons associated with investigation. Expands statutory obligation of district attorney to disclose exculpatory evidence and impeachment evidence. Modifies timing of disclosures.] Provides that remedy for violation of discovery obligation may be dismissal of charges, or dismissal of charges with prejudice if violation concerned exculpatory evidence or impeachment evidence.] Establishes procedures for taking of depositions in criminal cases.] Modifies definition of "disclose" for purposes of discovery requirements in criminal cases. Requires provision of copy of, or opportunity to conduct testing on, certain material or information subject to disclosure. Provides that exculpatory material or information must be disclosed to defendant regardless of whether material or information is recorded or in writing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pretrial discovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Evans, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard.
2021-04-21SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback