OR SB743 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows owner of territory not contiguous to city to annex to city if land is within 200 feet of existing city boundary, city was under jurisdiction of boundary commission on January 1, 2007, and owner acquired interest in territory prior to January 1, 1973.
Title
Relating to annexation of noncontiguous territory within an urban growth boundary; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |