OR SB740 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health benefit plans that cover radiation therapy for cancer to cover proton beam therapy on basis no less favorable than other covered benefits. Permits prior authorization or other utilization review.
Title
Relating to cancer treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 466, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Boles, Clem, Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |