OR SB731 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tribal police officers. Modifies provisions relating to tribal police officers.
Title
Relating to tribal police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 408, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 8--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Lewis, Moore-Green, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |