OR SB731 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date, June 7, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective date, June 7, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to deoxyribonucleic acid; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to deoxyribonucleic acid; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Effective date, June 7, 2011. | |
2011-06-07 | Chapter 275, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-07 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-31 | President signed. | |
2011-05-25 | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-05-24 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-23 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-18 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-11 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-04-05 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-04 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Verger. | |
2011-03-31 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-03-28 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |