OR SB72 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective date, May 16, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective date, May 16, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disabled veterans; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to disabled veterans; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective date, May 16, 2011. | |
2011-05-16 | Chapter 29, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-16 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-10 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-06 | President signed. | |
2011-05-05 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hicks. | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Wingard. | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 5, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-27 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 28, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-25 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-21 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 21, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-18 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-08 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-05 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-29 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Veterans Affairs. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Starr. | |
2011-02-15 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Veterans' and Military Affairs. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |