OR SB717 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires specified health care professional training programs to include in required curricula training on standardized clinical breast examinations.
Title
Relating to clinical breast examinations; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |