OR SB704 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Universal Health Plan Governance Board and directs board to create comprehensive plan for implementing Universal Health Plan . Establishes Universal Health Plan Governance Board and directs board to create comprehensive plan for implementing Universal Health Plan beginning in 2027]. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to universal health care; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Rules then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Rules and then Ways and Means by prior reference. Referred to Rules by order of the President then Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |