OR SB698 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Judicial Department to develop and implement automated system that identifies convictions, arrests, citations, charges and judgments of guilty except for insanity that are eligible to be automatically sealed. Directs Judicial Department to develop and implement automated system that identifies convictions, arrests, citations, charges and judgments of guilty except for insanity that are eligible to be automatically sealed. Directs department to identify eligible records created prior to February 1, 2025, and send list to presiding judge of judicial district where record was created no later than February 15, 2025. Directs department to, beginning March 1, 2025, and every month thereafter, identify eligible records from previous month and send list to presiding judge of judicial district. Directs presiding judge to enter order sealing records within 30 days of receipt of list. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to, beginning no later than February 1, 2026, and each year thereafter, provide report to interim legislative committees related to judiciary concerning convictions that have been automatically sealed during previous year. Directs court to grant motion to set aside judgment of guilty except for insanity if no objection is received. Requires criminal history data providers to ensure criminal history reports reflect all material changes from previous 30 days. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the sealing of records; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage. Request rescission of the subsequent referral to Ways and Means, and be returned to the President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the President. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be Printed Engrossed and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage, requesting rescission of subsequent referral to Ways and Means and request referral to Rules. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |