OR SB685 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renames Law Enforcement Contacts Policy and Data Review Committee to Commission on Equity in Policing. Changes deadline of annual report by commission to interim legislative committees from December 1 to June 1. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the Law Enforcement Contacts Policy and Data Review Committee; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB685 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB685/Introduced |