OR SB665 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Forester to actively manage state forestlands to achieve and maintain low forest fuel load levels. Requires State Forester to actively manage state forestlands to achieve and maintain low forest fuel load levels.
Title
Relating to low forest fuel load levels on state forestland.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Richard Anderson [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Golden, Sollman. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Natural Resources failed. Ayes, 13; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |