OR SB660 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public universities, in consultation with Department of Revenue, to develop comprehensive proposal to make public universities as financially independent from state as possible and to reduce hardship imposed on Oregon residents by student loan debt. Requires public universities to file report containing comprehensive proposal with Legislative Assembly by September 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to higher education; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB660 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB660/Introduced |