OR SB649 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires licensed health care provider to provide vaccine information packet to patient to whom licensed health care provider administers vaccine. Requires Oregon Health Authority to maintain website that provides specific vaccine information. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to ingredients in vaccines; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Dennis Linthicum [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] |
Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB649 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB649/Introduced |