OR SB63 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that Psychiatric Security Review Board or Oregon Health Authority notify court or juvenile department of hearing concerning commitment of person found guilty except for insanity or youth found responsible except for insanity. Extends from 15 days to 30 days time period after hearing within which board or authority is required to notify specified parties of order or decision made by board or authority.
Title
Relating to correspondence of agencies exercising jurisdiction over persons.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 232, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Hernandez; Excused, 4--Boone, McKeown, Smith G, Wilson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-26 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |