OR SB610 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates psychology provider incentive program within Oregon Health Authority to provide financial incentives to students enrolled in approved doctoral programs in psychology who complete courses that provide cultural competency training. Creates psychology provider incentive program within Oregon Health Authority to provide financial incentives to students enrolled in approved doctoral programs in psychology who complete courses that provide cultural competency training. Requires program to provide loan repayment subsidies to certain licensed psychologists. Establishes Psychology Provider Incentive Fund. Requires Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to guarantee full-time employment to certain licensed psychologists. Requires public employer to award hiring preference to certain licensed psychologists. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to mental health care provider incentives; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means. Referral denied by order of the President (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |