OR SB605 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that Land Conservation and Development Commission must make findings on Territorial Sea Plan and amendments to Territorial Sea Plan or Oregon Ocean Resources Management Plan recommended by Ocean Policy Advisory Council.
Title
Relating to ocean resources; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, June 13, 2013. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 416, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. |
2013-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Gelser; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Matthews. |
2013-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2013-04-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Steiner Hayward. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development, then Ways and Means. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |