OR SB602 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to appoint long term care wage board to examine factors that may present challenges to recruiting and retaining long term care employees. Directs Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries to appoint long term care wage board to examine factors that may present challenges to recruiting and retaining long term care employees. Requires board to adopt recommended compensation schedule for long term care employees. Requires board to submit annual report to commissioner. Allows commissioner to consider recommended schedule in establishing compensation rates for long term care employees.
Title
Relating to the long term care wage board.
Sponsors
Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |