OR SB570 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes product stewardship program for mattresses. Establishes product stewardship program for mattresses. Establishes Mattress Stewardship Fund. Establishes mattress stewardship program advisory committee. Requires stewardship organizations to submit plans for mattress stewardship programs to Department of Environmental Quality. Imposes civil penalties for violation of program provisions not to exceed, per day for each day of violation, $100 for violation by retailer, $1,000 for violation by producer or renovator and $1,000 for violation by stewardship organization. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to mattresses; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |