OR SB564 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that personally identifiable information may not be reported to Oregon Health Authority for purposes related to collecting data related to cancer and benign tumors of brain and central nervous system. Requires authority, on or before January 1, 2016, to remove all personally identifiable information from registry system. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the registry system for the collection of information related to cancer; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB564 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB564/Introduced |