OR SB562 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Incorporates certain provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act into Oregon laws relating to youth offenders adjudicated for status offenses and to adoptions. Declares that person may not be disqualified from service as child welfare service provider based on certain traits. Declares that child, ward or youth may not be prohibited from, disciplined for or retaliated against for publicly or privately speaking about child's, ward's or youth's experience receiving child welfare services.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Incorporates certain provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act into Oregon laws relating to youth offenders adjudicated for status offenses and to adoptions. Enhances state protections for Indian children in certain situations. Authorizes juvenile court to approve tribal customary adoption as permanency option for wards who are Indian children. Modifies court process to determine whether there is reason to know child is Indian child. Makes technical corrections to child welfare laws involving Indian children. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to children; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 398, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Zika. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |