OR SB555 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates option of members of individual account program of Public Employees Retirement System to receive distributions as installment payments upon retirement. Requires members retiring on or after January 1, 2021, to receive distributions as lump sum.
Title
Relating to distributions under the individual account program of the Public Employees Retirement System.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB555 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB555/Introduced |