OR SB5547 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from American Rescue Plan Act Coronavirus Local Fiscal Recovery Fund moneys collected or received by Oregon Department of Administrative Services for payments to eligible nonentitlement units of local government. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Limits biennial expenditures from American Rescue Plan Act Coronavirus Local Fiscal Recovery Fund moneys collected or received by Oregon Department of Administrative Services for payments to eligible nonentitlement units of local government. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021] on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 666, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Evans, Wright; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |