OR SB5544 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture for wolf depredation compensation and financial assistance grant program. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Fish and Wildlife for sage grouse conservation efforts. Limits biennial expenditures for payment of expenses of sage grouse conservation efforts by State Department of Fish and Wildlife from grant from Intermountain West Joint Venture. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Chapter 607, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hack. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Holvey; Excused, 1--Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 18, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-16 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |