OR SB5538 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs for certain biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Veterans' Affairs for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures by department from lottery moneys for certain purposes. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and Oregon War Veterans' Bond Sinking Account, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Veterans' Affairs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-03 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2023. |
2023-08-03 | Senate | Chapter 485, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Mannix. Passed. Ayes, 50; Excused, 9--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Diehl, Levy B, Nguyen D, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Hansell. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 22; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Woods. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |