OR SB5518 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Effective date, July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Environmental Quality for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, specified bond proceeds and specified federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits biennial expenditures from lottery moneys allocated from Parks and Natural Resources Fund to department. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Limits certain biennial expenditures by department from federal funds. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Environmental Quality; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Chapter 591, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Boone, Heard. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 10--Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher, Winters; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |